+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 14, 2007 in the House:
- Final disposition: None
- Action: Signed
- Chaptered version: Conference engrossed version
- Chapter: 205
On May 9, 2007 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On May 8, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On May 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate final read: Passed
On May 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On May 3, 2007 in the House:
- House final read: Passed
- House adopts conference committee
On May 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts conference committee
On April 26, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Health
- Health: Recommended not to concur
On April 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: that the House accept the Senate amendments with exceptions and the bill be further amended.
- Senate appointed: Allen C, Garcia, Leff
On April 24, 2007 in the House:
- House appointed: Mcclure, Ableser, Paton
On April 23, 2007 in the House:
- Conference committee recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 18, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Allen flr amend (ref HEALTH) (sub RULES)
- Amendment adopted: HEALTH (ref Bill)
- Amendment: RULES (ref HEALTH)
On April 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On April 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On March 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Health: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On March 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Health
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Senate second read
On February 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On February 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 2:00 pm
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 8, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- House first read
+ − Amendments (10)
Conference Committee
Conference Adopted Amendment
Allen Floor Amendment, reference to HEALTH amendment; substitute to RULES amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Health - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Allen Floor Amendment, reference to HEALTH amendment; substitute to RULES amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Health - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Health - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Conference Committee
Conference Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Health - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
May 8, 2007: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
May 3, 2007: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Present/NV: 4
April 18, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 25
- Present/NV: 5
March 19, 2007: Health: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 14, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
January 8, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor