+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: held.
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- HEALTH - passed as amended
- Floor Amend to HEALTH to Bill - Carter - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- House Health Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Health Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
February 27, 2017: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
February 21, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 12
January 10, 2017: House Health Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 10, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor