+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
- HB 2018 substituted for SB 1164. Motion carried.: PASSED
- First read in Senate.
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 3:17PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
- House Education Committee: do pass.
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Education Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (4)
February 4, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
January 28, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
January 11, 2021: House Education Committee
- Yeas: 10
January 11, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor