+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On March 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 15, 2023 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On March 7, 2023 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 6, 2023 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:30PM.
On January 18, 2023 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On January 17, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 11, 2023 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (3)
March 15, 2023: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 10
January 11, 2023: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 3
January 11, 2023: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor