+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 12, 2024 in the House:
- Motion by Representative Griffin, notwithstanding House Rule 23(A), to further extend the reconsideration period for HB2015. Passed by vv.: PASSED
On February 27, 2024 in the House:
- Third read in House: FAILED
- Motion by Representative Kolodin to reconsider the Third Reading of HB2015 within the next 14 days. Passed by vv.
On February 14, 2024 in the House:
- Amended by NREW - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 6, 2024 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 5, 2024 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On January 30, 2024 in the House:
- House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee: do pass amended.
On January 10, 2024 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 9, 2024 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 27, 2024: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 28
January 9, 2024: House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
January 9, 2024: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor