+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Economic Development
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Rules
- Senate second read
On February 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On February 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 2:00 pm
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 8, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- House first read
+ − Amendments (2)
Commerce and Economic Development - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 13, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Present/NV: 6
January 8, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor