+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass.
- First read in Senate.
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 7, 2023 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On March 2, 2023 in the House:
- Amended by WM - replaced by substitute
- SUB Floor Amend to WM - Livingston - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 21, 2023 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- House Ways & Means Committee: do pass amended.
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 9, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Ways & Means Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
March 13, 2023: Senate Finance and Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
March 13, 2023: Senate Finance & Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
March 13, 2023: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
March 7, 2023: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 29
January 9, 2023: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
January 9, 2023: House Ways & Means Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor