+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 274
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety, Military and Technology
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: GHE
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to GHE - Ugenti
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to GHE - Fann
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Government and Higher Education: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government and Higher Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Government and Higher Education - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Government and Higher Education - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Floor Amend to GHE - Ugenti - passed
House Adopted Amendment
Floor Amend to GHE - Fann - passed
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 30, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
March 10, 2015: Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
March 9, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 1
February 3, 2015: Government and Higher Education: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
February 3, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor