+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 128
- Action: Signed
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Transmit to House
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to RHS - Brophy McGee
- Amendment passed: RHS
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Reform and Human Services: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Reform and Human Services
- House first read
+ − Amendments (7)
Reform and Human Services - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Reform and Human Services - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Brophy McGee Floor Amendment; Reference to REFORM AND HUMAN SERVICES Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Reform and Human Services - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Brophy McGee Floor Amendment; Reference to REFORM AND HUMAN SERVICES Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Reform and Human Services - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
3-18 hhs
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 17, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 3
March 10, 2014: Health and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
March 5, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
February 17, 2014: Reform and Human Services: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 8
February 17, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor