+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On March 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 22, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On March 20, 2007 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 19, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 8, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (2)
March 22, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Present/NV: 5
January 8, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor