+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 18, 2010 in the House:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 5
On March 15, 2010 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 12, 2010 in the House:
- Motion to substitute HB 2005 for SB 1005. Motion carried.
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Senate first read
- Third read: Passed
On March 9, 2010 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- House second read
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Appropriations: Do pass
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- House first read
+ − Amendment
5-6 approp_asenacted
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (4)
March 11, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 25
March 11, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
March 9, 2010: Appropriations: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 1
March 9, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor