+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce Committee: held.
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Commerce Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Amended by APPROP - passed as amended
- Floor Amend to APPROP - Friese - failed
- Floor Amend to APPROP - Epstein - failed
- Floor Amend to APPROP - Cobb #1 - passed
- Floor Amend to APPROP - Cobb #3 - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: withdrawn.
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (3)
March 3, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 29
February 10, 2021: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 6
February 10, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor