+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 11
- Action: Signed
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Transmit to House
On April 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:25 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Banking and Insurance: Do pass
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Banking and Insurance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 1, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 2:23 pm
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- Banking and Insurance: Do pass
On January 12, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Banking and Insurance
- House first read
+ − Amendment
2-25 bi
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 5, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
February 16, 2011: Banking and Insurance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
February 8, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
January 11, 2011: Banking and Insurance: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
January 11, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor