+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On May 11, 2010 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 310
On April 30, 2010 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 29, 2010 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 29, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 29, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
On April 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Harper #3 flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Harper #2 flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment withdrawn: Harper #1 flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Melvin flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: FIN (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On April 20, 2010 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On April 7, 2010 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass amended
On March 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Senate second read
On March 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On March 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 23, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 18, 2010 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: COM - passed as amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to COM - Reagan
On March 15, 2010 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 17, 2010 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- House first read
+ − Amendments (14)
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Harper #2 flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Adopted Amendment
Reagan Floor amendment; reference to the Commerce Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Finance
Senate Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Reagan Floor amendment; reference to the Commerce Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Harper #3 flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Harper #2 flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Harper #3 flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 29, 2010: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 2
April 29, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 3
March 25, 2010: Finance: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
March 23, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 6
February 15, 2010: Commerce: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 8
February 15, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor