+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 82
- Action: Signed
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Gray flr amend (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:10 pmobject
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety and Human Services
- Senate first read
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: TRANS
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - McLain
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Transportation: Do pass amended
On January 12, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- House first read
+ − Amendments (10)
Transportation
House Proposed Amendment
Gray flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
McLain Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Transportation
House Adopted Amendment
Transportation
House Adopted Amendment
Transportation
House Proposed Amendment
Gray flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
McLain Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
4-21 pshs_asenacted
Senate Fact Sheet
3-7 pshs
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 7, 2011: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 3
April 5, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
March 1, 2011: Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
February 28, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 2
January 11, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 11, 2011: Transportation: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor