+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On February 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 21, 2023 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Livingston - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 14, 2023 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2023 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:00PM.
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On January 11, 2023 in the House:
- House Ways & Means Committee: do pass.
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 9, 2023 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Ways & Means Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 27, 2023: Senate Appropriations1 Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 27, 2023: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 21, 2023: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 29
January 9, 2023: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 5
January 9, 2023: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
January 9, 2023: House Ways & Means Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor