+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Peshlakai flr amend (ref Bill) failed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration with recommendation for a floor amendment.
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass.
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Amended by WM - passed
- Floor Amend to Bill - Finchem #1 - passed
- Floor Amend to Bill - Finchem #2 - passed
- bill passed dpa by s/v 30-22
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- House Ways and Means Committee: do pass amended.
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Ways and Means Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
April 19, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 12
March 6, 2018: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
March 5, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 22
January 9, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
January 9, 2018: House Ways and Means Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3