+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 40
- Action: Signed
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Safety: Do pass
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety
- Senate first read
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Amendment passed: PSMRA
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs: Do pass amended
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs
- House first read
+ − Amendments (7)
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs
House Proposed Amendment
Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs
House Adopted Amendment
Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs
House Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs
House Adopted Amendment
2-24 ps
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 15, 2014: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 60
April 8, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 25
- Present/NV: 5
February 18, 2014: Public Safety: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 10, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
January 14, 2014: Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
January 14, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor