+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 8, 2007 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 182
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Final disposition: None
On May 3, 2007 in the House:
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On May 1, 2007 in the House:
- Transportation: Recommended to concur
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 30, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
On April 26, 2007 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 24, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: TRANS (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Blendu flr amend (ref TRANS)
On April 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transportation: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On March 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
On March 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 6, 2007 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 5, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 4:00 pm
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 8, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (11)
Transportation - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Transportation - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Blendu Floor Amendment, reference to TRANS amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Transportation - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Transportation - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
4-2 strikermemo corrected caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Blendu Floor Amendment, reference to TRANS amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-29 strikermemo caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
4-3 strikermemo c-flr 2nd corrected
Senate Fact Sheet
4-30trans_aspassedbysenate
Senate Fact Sheet
3-23 trans strikermemo
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
May 3, 2007: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 4
April 30, 2007: Transportation: Recommended to concur (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 3
April 24, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
March 19, 2007: Transportation: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
March 13, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
January 8, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor