+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 23, 2010 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 115
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 20, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:00 pm
On April 7, 2010 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass
On March 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On February 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 23, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 11, 2010 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On January 26, 2010 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On January 25, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 3:30 pmobject
On January 14, 2010 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass
On January 12, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On January 11, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (3)
Finance - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Finance - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
3-15 fin
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 19, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 2
March 2, 2010: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
February 23, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 3
January 11, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
January 11, 2010: Ways and Means: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (46)
Type:
Primary Sponsor