+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 9:29AM.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- House Local and International Affairs Committee: do pass.
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Local and International Affairs Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
February 21, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 16
January 22, 2018: House Health Committee
- Yeas: 8
January 9, 2018: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 13
January 9, 2018: House Local and International Affairs Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 9, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor