+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (43)
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0345)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 345 (effective 7/1/19)
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1626ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 19107056D-S1 (80-Y 18-N 1-A)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (80-Y 18-N 1-A)
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 1-N 1-A)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1626S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 19107056D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 19107056D-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 1-N)
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Courts of Justice
- Rereferred from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (78-Y 16-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (78-Y 16-N)
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Printed as reengrossed 19100448D-E2
- Reengrossed by House as amended HB1626E2
- Amendments by Delegate Orrock agreed to
- Committee amendment rejected
- Committee amendment reconsidered
- Engrossment reconsidered by House
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1626E
- Amendments by Delegate Orrock agreed to
- Printed as engrossed 19100448D-E
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (19-Y 3-N)
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 1-N)
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #1
On October 23, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100448D
+ − Impact Statements (4)
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (8)
February 19, 2019: VOTE: ADOPTION (80-Y 18-N 1-A)
February 18, 2019: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 1-N 1-A)
February 15, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2019: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 1-N)
January 24, 2019: VOTE: PASSAGE (78-Y 16-N)
January 16, 2019: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (19-Y 3-N)
January 14, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor