+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB1004 is now Act 811
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by P. Malone
+ − Votes (2)
March 28, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 28
- Present/NV: 16
March 16, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor