+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB903 is now Act 808
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 18, 2011 in the House:
- EXPUNGED
- The vote by which SB903 Passed was expunged.
- Re-referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
- Filed
+ − Votes (3)
March 28, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 86
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 10
March 17, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 81
- Present/NV: 18
March 16, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor