+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- New draft substituted as amended, see S2142
- Read second
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 3, 2016
- Order relative to subject matter adopted
- Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S2142
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On July 10, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/14/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
- Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD
On July 8, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/14/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- House concurred
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities
+ − Amendment
Amendment #1
An Act to increase the Commonwealth's
compliance with federal law meeting requirements of the Americans
with Disabilities Act
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor