+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- Accompanied H1144
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
On December 7, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 12/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Public Health
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor