+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 25, 2018 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H4654
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing rescheduled to 05/31/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/31/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Service