+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On September 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- New draft substituted, as amended, see S2014
- Read second
On September 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, September 24, 2015
- Order relative to subject matter adopted
- Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2014
On August 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On July 9, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2015 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- House concurred
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Transportation
+ − Sponsors (52)
Type:
Primary Sponsor