+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 1, 2019 in the House:
- No further action taken
On June 7, 2018 in the House:
- Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
On May 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 21, 2018 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 13, 2018, pending concurrence
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 25, 2018, pending concurrence