+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On May 7, 2018 in the House:
- Accompanied a new draft, see H4470
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Amendment (changing reporting date to Friday May 4, 2018) adopted, pending concurrence
- Reporting date extended to Monday May 7, 2018, pending concurrence
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Tuesday March 20, 2018, pending concurrence
On August 28, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2017 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor