+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On July 18, 2018 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H4778
On October 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing rescheduled to 10/30/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
- Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Discharged to the committee on Financial Services
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Service
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor