+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On June 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a study order, see S2234
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Monday June 30, 2014, pending concurrence
On November 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 11/13/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on The Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor