+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- Notification that HB1343 is now Act 84
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as Passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
- Received from the House.
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
- RULES SUSPENDED
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on Joint Budget Committee
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
February 16, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
February 10, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 84
- Present/NV: 14