+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 6, 2016 in the House:
- Notification that HB1040 is now Act 216
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as Passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Joint Budget Committee
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
- RULES SUSPENDED
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
May 3, 2016: Read the third time and passed.
April 26, 2016: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 9
+ − Sponsor
Joint Budget Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor