+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Notification that HB1196 is now Act 945
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as Passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Joint Budget Committee
On February 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
- Received from the House.
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on Joint Budget Committee
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 30, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
February 3, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 95
- Present/NV: 3