+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Notification that HB1372 is now Act 162
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as Passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
- Received from the House.
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
February 13, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
February 12, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 94
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor