+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On July 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported by S2334
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of conference appointed (Bradley-Markey-Orrall), in concurrence
- House insisted on its amendment
- Rules suspended
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of Conference appointed (Spilka-Creem-Ross)
- Senate NON-concurred in the House amendments
- Rules suspended
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Rules suspended
- Read second
- Amendment pending, as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means, see H4034
- Further amendment adopted, see H4037
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Read third
- Passed to be engrossed - 142 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 330)
- Motion to reconsider prevailed
- Amendment adopted
- Passed to be engrossed as amended (for text, as amended, see H4038)
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment pending
- Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending
- Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of an amendment, H4034
On October 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
On October 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed to be engrossed -- see Roll Call #198 [YEAS 35 - NAYS 0]
- Text of S1892, printed as amended