+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On December 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2018, c.150.
On October 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (50-26-2)
- Substituted for A4351
On July 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
On July 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (31-0)
On July 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading
+ − Votes (3)
October 29, 2018: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 2
October 29, 2018: SUB FOR A4351
- Present/NV: 80
July 26, 2018: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 9
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor