+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (10)
On January 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
On January 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (62-4-1)
- Substituted for A4296
On December 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On June 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On June 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (36-0)
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On December 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
+ − Votes (5)
January 8, 2018: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 13
January 8, 2018: SUBSTITUTE FOR A4296
- Present/NV: 80
December 18, 2017: r/favorably
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
June 26, 2017: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
June 15, 2017: r/favorably
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor