+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (40)
On April 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 4/24 LEGIS RESOLVE 6
On April 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 8:50 AM 4/4/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 28, 2003 in the House:
- MLV RPT 5DP
- DP: CISSNA, GRUENBERG, DAHLSTROM,
- MASEK, LYNN
- FN1: ZERO(S.STA)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/28/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 9(STA)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y38 E1 A1
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSSJR 9(STA)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): CISSNA, BERKOWITZ,
- HEINZE, MASEK, HARRIS, STOLTZE,
- ROKEBERG, MEYER
On March 26, 2003 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GRUENBERG
On March 19, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN, WILSON
- MLV
On March 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): WILKEN, COWDERY, DYSON,
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/18/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 9(STA)
- ELLIS, ELTON, FRENCH, GREEN, GUESS,
- HOFFMAN, LINCOLN, OLSON, SEEKINS,
- STEVENS B, STEVENS G, TAYLOR,
- THERRIAULT, WAGONER
- PASSED Y18 N- E1 A1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSJR 9(STA)
On March 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(S.STA)
- DYSON, GUESS
- DP: STEVENS G, HOFFMAN, COWDERY,
- STA RPT CS 5DP SAME TITLE
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor