+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (30)
On March 28, 2001 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 3/27 LEGIS RESOLVE 7
On March 13, 2001 in the Senate:
- 2:15 PM 3/13/01 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 9, 2001 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WILSON, MURKOWSKI
- VERSION: SJR 9
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y34 E4 A2
- READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 9
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/9/01
On February 23, 2001 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): FOSTER
- FN1: ZERO(S.STA)
- DP: MURKOWSKI, GREEN, KOTT, CHENAULT
- MLV RPT 4DP
On February 9, 2001 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- MLV
On February 8, 2001 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SJR 9
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED Y17 N- E3
- WARD, AUSTERMAN
- COSPONSOR(S): DONLEY, TAYLOR, WILKEN,
- READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 9
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 1OR 2/8/01
On February 7, 2001 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(S.STA)
- DP: THERRIAULT, PHILLIPS, DAVIS
- STA RPT 3DP
On January 29, 2001 in the Senate:
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor