+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On April 10, 1995 in the Senate:
- READ BY GOVERNOR 4/7 LEGIS RESOLVE 9
On March 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- 12:55 PM 3/6/95 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 3, 1995 in the House:
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- PASSED Y36 E4
- READ THE SECOND TIME SCR 4
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/03/95
On March 1, 1995 in the House:
- SENATE ZERO FN (DOE) 2/3/95
- NR: GREEN
- DP: JAMES, PORTER, ROBINSON, WILLIS
- STA RPT 4DP 1NR
On February 10, 1995 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- STATE AFFAIRS
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): TOOHEY, NAVARRE
On February 9, 1995 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- TAYLOR, GREEN, TORGERSON
- COSPONSOR(S): HALFORD, DUNCAN, ZHAROFF,
- READ THE SECOND TIME SCR 4
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/9/95
On February 3, 1995 in the Senate:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DOE)
- STA RPT 4DP
On January 20, 1995 in the Senate:
- STATE AFFAIRS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)