+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (44)
On March 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 3/27 LEGIS RESOLVE 4
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- 3:52 PM 3/4/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- ROKEBERG, ANDERSON
- HARRIS, CHENAULT, GRUENBERG, WILSON,
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KOHRING, MCGUIRE,
- VERSION: SJR 4
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y36 N2 E1 V1
- READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 4
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/26/2003
On February 24, 2003 in the House:
- DP: GATTO, WOLF, MASEK, HEINZE,
- RES RPT 6DP
- FN2: ZERO(REV)
- GUTTENBERG, CHENAULT
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
On February 12, 2003 in the House:
- LYNN
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): STOLTZE, DAHLSTROM,
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On February 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y6 N11 E1 A2
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- VERSION: SJR 4
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y16 N1 E1 A2
On February 7, 2003 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): TAYLOR, OGAN
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/7/2003
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 4
- PASSED Y15 N1 E4
- ELTON NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On February 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(DNR); FN2: ZERO(REV)
- DYSON; DNP: LINCOLN; NR: ELTON
- DP: OGAN, STEVENS B, SEEKINS, WAGONER,
- RES RPT 5DP 1DNP 1NR
On January 29, 2003 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): FRENCH
On January 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- COWDERY, GREEN
- COSPONSOR(S): OLSON, STEVENS B, HOFFMAN
On January 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor