+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 4/24 LEGIS RESOLVE 7
On April 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- 9:22 AM 4/11/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 7, 2003 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y17 N- E3
On April 4, 2003 in the House:
- VERSION: HCS CSSCR 4(STA) AM H
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): SAMUELS
- PASSED Y38 E2
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- STA HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/4/2003
On March 28, 2003 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(S.STA)
- DAHLSTROM, BERKOWITZ, WEYHRAUCH
- DP: SEATON, GRUENBERG, HOLM, LYNN,
- STA RPT HCS(STA) 7DP
On March 26, 2003 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GRUENBERG
On March 19, 2003 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN
On March 14, 2003 in the House:
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSSCR 4(STA)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- COSPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN, DAVIS, STEVENS G
- STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/12/2003
On March 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(S.STA)
- DP: STEVENS G, COWDERY, DYSON
- STA RPT CS 3DP SAME TITLE
On February 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor