+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 28, 2001 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 3/27 LEGIS RESOLVE 9
On March 16, 2001 in the Senate:
- 3:05 PM 3/16/01 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 14, 2001 in the House:
- VERSION: CSSCR 4(STA)
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y37 E2 A1
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/14/01
On March 9, 2001 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): COGHILL, FATE,
- FN1: ZERO(S.STA)
- COGHILL
- DP: WILSON, STEVENS, JAMES, FATE,
- STA RPT 5DP
On February 28, 2001 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA
On February 26, 2001 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSSCR 4(STA)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- COSPONSOR(S):COWDERY, TAYLOR
- STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 1OR 2/26/01
On February 21, 2001 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(S.STA)
- DAVIS
- NR: THERRIAULT; DP: HALFORD, PHILLIPS,
- STA RPT CS 3DP 1NR SAME TITLE
On February 12, 2001 in the Senate:
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS