+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (47)
On July 28, 1999 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED IN THE (S)
On May 25, 1999 in the House:
- RETURNED TO SENATE
On May 19, 1999 in the House:
- FAILED PASSAGE Y26 N12 A2
- READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 3
On May 18, 1999 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KOHRING, ROKEBERG
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/19 CALENDAR
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y11 N27 A2
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/18/99
On May 17, 1999 in the House:
- DP: MULDER, BUNDE, KOHRING, AUSTERMAN,
- FIN RPT 6DP 1DNP 2NR
- NR: GRUSSENDORF, MOSES
- DAVIS, WILLIAMS; DNP: DAVIES;
- SENATE FISCAL NOTE (GOV) 2/11/99
On May 13, 1999 in the House:
- SENATE FISCAL NOTE (GOV) 2/11/99
- DP: KOTT, JAMES; NR: MURKOWSKI, GREEN
- JUD RPT 2DP 2NR
On April 8, 1999 in the House:
- SENATE FISCAL NOTE (GOV) 2/11/99
- DNP: SMALLEY, KERTTULA; NR: HUDSON
- DP: JAMES, COGHILL, WHITAKER, OGAN;
- STA RPT 4DP 2DNP 1NR
On March 24, 1999 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- STA, JUD, FIN
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HARRIS
On March 23, 1999 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y15 N5
On March 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- HELD ON RECONSIDERATION TO 3/23 CALENDAR
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y14 N4 E2
- COSPONSOR(S): TIM KELLY, PHILLIPS
- READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 3
On March 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR AND 1 OR 3/16/99
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCE TO THIRD READING FLD Y14 N4 E2
- THIRD READING 3/17 CALENDAR
On February 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS FISCAL NOTE (GOV)
- PETE KELLY, WILKEN, LEMAN; DNP: ADAMS
- DP: TORGERSON, PARNELL; NR: GREEN,
- FIN RPT 2DP 4NR 1DNP
On February 11, 1999 in the Senate:
- FISCAL NOTE (GOV)
On February 5, 1999 in the Senate:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (GOV)
On February 1, 1999 in the Senate:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (S.STA)
- DP: WARD, PHILLIPS, MACKIE; DNP: ELTON
- STA RPT 3DP 1DNP
On January 21, 1999 in the Senate:
- STA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)