+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On July 20, 2001 in the Senate:
- 3:10 PM 6/20/01 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- PERMANENTLY FILED 7/7 LEGIS RESOLVE 35
On May 8, 2001 in the House:
- VERSION: CSSJR 21(HES)
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On May 7, 2001 in the House:
- BERKOWITZ NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y34 N2 A4
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 21(HES)
On May 6, 2001 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/6/01
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/7 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On April 21, 2001 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(HSS)
- NR: BUNDE
- LANCASTER, MOSES, HUDSON, WILLIAMS;
- DP: WHITAKER, HARRIS, CROFT, DAVIES,
- FIN RPT 8DP 1NR
On April 18, 2001 in the House:
- HES RPT 4DP 1DNP 1NR
- DNP: COGHILL; NR: DYSON
- DP: WILSON, CISSNA, JOULE, STEVENS;
- FN1: ZERO(HSS)
On April 12, 2001 in the House:
- HES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 11, 2001 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/01
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- HES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 21(HES)
- PASSED Y18 N- E1 A1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSJR 21(HES)
On March 29, 2001 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(HSS)
- DP: GREEN, LEMAN, WILKEN, DAVIS
- HES RPT CS 4DP SAME TITLE
On March 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- HES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
HEALTH
Type:
Primary Sponsor