+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- RETURNED TO RULES COMMITTEE
- DP: EASTMAN, CHENAULT, REINBOLD, LEDOUX
- RLS RPT HCS(2D RLS) NT 4DP 2DNP 1NR
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- DNP: KITO, CLAMAN
- NR: STUTES
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): TARR
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- AM: EASTMAN, CHENAULT, REINBOLD
- RLS RPT HCS(RLS) NT 4DP 3AM
- RETURNED TO RULES COMMITTEE
- RULES TO CALENDAR PENDING RULES REPORT
- DP: KITO, CLAMAN, STUTES, LEDOUX
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- NR: EASTMAN
- DP: JOHNSTON, EDGMON, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, KITO, SPOHNHOLZ
- HSS RPT 5DP 1NR
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- STA RPT 7DP
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- DP: JOHNSON, WOOL, LEDOUX, KNOPP, BIRCH, TUCK, KREISS-TOMKINS
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI
- STA, HSS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SCR 2
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/6/2017
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- DP: WILSON, BEGICH, VON IMHOF, GIESSEL, MICCICHE
- HSS RPT 5DP
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- STA REFERRAL WAIVED UC
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- STA, HSS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS