+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- REPORT RECEIVED
On April 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 4/8 LEGIS RESOLVE 55
On March 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- 12:10 PM 3/25/98 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y14 N1 E5
On March 18, 1998 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/13/98
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y29 N1 E10
- VEZEY NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- REFERRED TO RULES
- SENATE INDETERMINATE FN (DOE) 2/6/98
- NR: GRUSSENDORF, DAVIS
- DAVIES, MOSES, FOSTER, KELLY;
- DP: THERRIAULT, HANLEY, MULDER, MARTIN,
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 8DP 2NR
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- ADDITIONAL REFERRAL TO FIN
- REFERRED TO FIN
On March 2, 1998 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- RULES
On February 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED Y14 N4 E2 CSSCR 19(FIN) AM
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR AND 1AM 2/27/98
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT CS 3DP 2NR SAME TITLE
- PREVIOUS INDETERMINATE FN (DOE)
- DP: SHARP, ADAMS, TORGERSON
- NR: PHILLIPS, PARNELL
On February 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- INDETERMINATE FN TO SCR & CS (DOE)
- AM: LEMAN
- DP: WILKEN, WARD; NR: GREEN, ELLIS
- HES RPT CS 2DP 2NR 1AM SAME TITLE
On January 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- HES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsor
RULES BY REQUEST OF DEFERRED MAINTENANCE TASK FORC
Type:
Primary Sponsor