+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On April 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- READ BY GOVERNOR 4/19 LEGIS RESOLVE 30
On April 6, 1994 in the Senate:
- 4:09 PM 4/5/94 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 30, 1994 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/30/94
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- OBJECTION TO ADOPTION OF STA CS
- AMEND ADOPTION MOTION/WITHDRAWN
- ADOPTION OF STA HCS MOTION WITHDRAWN
- PASSED Y37 N- E2 A1
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- BROWN, MULDER, BARNES, BRICE, BUNDE,
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WILLIS, MENARD,
- CARNEY, DAVIDSON, DAVIES, B.DAVIS,
- G.DAVIS, FINKELSTEIN, FOSTER, GREEN,
- GRUSSENDORF, HANLEY, HOFFMAN, HUDSON,
- JAMES, KOTT, MACKIE, MACLEAN, MARTIN,
- MOSES, NORDLUND, OLBERG, PARNELL,
- PHILLIPS, PORTER, SANDERS, SITTON,
- THERRIAULT, ULMER, VEZEY, WILLIAMS
On March 25, 1994 in the House:
- STA RPT HCS(STA) 3DP 3NR
- NR: G.DAVIS, OLBERG, B.DAVIS
- DP: VEZEY, KOTT, SANDERS
- -PREVIOUS SEN ZERO FN (S.STA) 3/7/94
On March 15, 1994 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): TOOHEY
On March 14, 1994 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): NICHOLIA, NAVARRE
On March 11, 1994 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LARSON
- STATE AFFAIRS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On March 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/10/94
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y18 N- E2
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On March 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- ZERO FN TO SCR & CS (S.STA)
- STA RPT CS 3DP NEW TITLE
On February 23, 1994 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): RIEGER, DONLEY, ELLIS
On February 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- STATE AFFAIRS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (55)
Type:
Primary Sponsor